+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 566 (effective 7/1/13)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0566)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1767ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 13105330D-H2
- Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by temporarily
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105133D-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1767S1
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House 13105133D-S1 (0-Y 96-N 1-A)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N 1-A)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Watson, Orrock, James
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Ruff, Stuart, Vogel
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13105133D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N)
- Read third time and passed House (87-Y 9-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1767H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104802D-H1
- Read second time
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104802D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #3
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103516D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
February 23, 2013: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N 1-A)
February 13, 2013: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N)
January 30, 2013: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
January 25, 2013: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor