+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 415 (effective 7/1/15)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1764ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 4-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1764H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104124D-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104124D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 7-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100516D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 24, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
February 23, 2015: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
February 4, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 7-N)
January 28, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor