+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0400)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 400 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1758ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed, passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (12-Y 3-N)
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1758H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104631D-H1
- Read second time
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11104631D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #1
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101826D
+ − Votes (9)
February 22, 2011: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 21, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed, passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 3-N)
January 31, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor