+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0909)
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (37-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 909 (effective 7/1/05)
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (37-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1757ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 29, 2005 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1757ER)
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1757H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 054344348-H1
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 054344348-H1
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Civil Law
On January 3, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 054288348
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 6, 2005: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (37-Y 0-N)
April 6, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2005: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2005: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor