+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 24, 2023 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 462 (effective 7/1/23)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1757ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 23107518D-H1
- Amended by conference committee
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 1-N)
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 91-N)
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute printed 23107409D-S1 (Petersen)
- Read third time
- Substitute by Senator Petersen withdrawn 23107409D-S1
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 91-N)
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Campbell, J.L., Leftwich, Simon
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Petersen, Deeds, Obenshain
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Judiciary with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Assigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100732D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
February 24, 2023: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2023: VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 1-N)
February 23, 2023: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 91-N)
February 23, 2023: Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2023: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2023: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2023: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2023: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2023: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2023: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor