+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 342 (effective 3/14/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1756ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1756H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13103987D-H1
- Read second time
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13103987D-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/13 13102245D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 19, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2013: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor