+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
On March 24, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 584 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1755ER)
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (94-Y 4-N)
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 3-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 017953836-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 017953836-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 017953836-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (8-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 014358836-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 014358836-H1
- Read second time
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 014358836-H1
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/20/00 010691836
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 3-N)
February 13, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2001: Reported from Rules with substitute (8-Y 1-N)
February 3, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2001: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor