+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 408 (effective 3/23/23)
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1753ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage Emergency (91-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 8-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1753H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 23104485D-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 23104485D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/11/23 23100992D