+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in C. J. (6-Y 8-N)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Aministrative Process ...
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 058884348-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1753E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: Subcommittee #4...
On January 3, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 058884348
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2005: Failed to report (defeated) in C. J. (6-Y 8-N)
February 2, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2005: Reported from General Laws with amd (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor