+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Requires 27 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's veto overridden (70-Y 28-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 18-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (70-Y 28-N)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1752ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (87-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 6-N)
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by House
- Conference report agreed to by House (87-Y 12-N)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 15-N)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (87-Y 12-N)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators: Black, McWaters, Locke
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Delegates: LaRock, Landes, Lindsey
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 1-N)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 15105304D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1752S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105304D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15105304D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 13-N)
- Read third time and passed House (84-Y 13-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1752H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104793D-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104793D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Education Reform
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103581D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (13)
April 15, 2015: Senate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 18-N)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (70-Y 28-N)
February 27, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (87-Y 12-N)
February 27, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 15-N)
February 27, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 6-N)
February 25, 2015: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 1-N)
February 24, 2015: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
February 23, 2015: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N)
February 20, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2015: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
February 9, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 13-N)
February 4, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor