+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 10, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087)
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 87 (effective 7/1/95)
On February 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1752ER)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (21-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed LD0239681
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1995: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1995: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor