+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1 (effective 2/16/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/15/18
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2018
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB175ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On December 22, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/18 18101909D
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2018: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor