+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0908)
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (37-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 908 (effective 7/1/05)
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (37-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1749ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 29, 2005 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1749ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1749H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 053539376-H1
- Read second time
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053539376-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (20-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 053373376
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 6, 2005: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (37-Y 0-N)
April 6, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2005: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2005: Reported from Tra. w/sub (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor