+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- No further action taken
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference report rejected by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
- Chair votes No
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 3-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate amendments rejected by House (4-Y 94-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 94-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senators: Vogel, Reeves, Petersen
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Cosgrove, Cox, J.A., Sickles
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment by Senator Northam agreed to (21-Y 19-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments #1, #2 waived
- Amendments #1, #2 by Senator Petersen agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Reading of amendment #3 waived
- Amendment #3 by Senator Petersen agreed to (20-Y 20-N)
- Chair votes yes
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 4-N)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 13101455D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1747E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101455D
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (12)
February 23, 2013: Conference report rejected by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
February 22, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N)
February 21, 2013: VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 94-N)
February 21, 2013: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2013: Amendment by Senator Northam agreed to (21-Y 19-N)
February 19, 2013: Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 4-N)
February 19, 2013: Amendment #3 by Senator Petersen agreed to (20-Y 20-N)
February 14, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N)
January 30, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
January 22, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
John A. Cosgrove-resigned 8/16
Type:
Primary Sponsor