+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Defeated by Senate (17-Y 21-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (20-Y 18-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (11-Y 3-N)
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 6-N)
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (19-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101420D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (9)
February 21, 2023: Defeated by Senate (17-Y 21-N)
February 21, 2023: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2023: Passed Senate (20-Y 18-N)
February 20, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2023: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 3-N)
January 25, 2023: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N)
January 19, 2023: Reported from Transportation (19-Y 1-N)
January 19, 2023: Reported from Transportation (19-Y 1-N)
January 17, 2023: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor