+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (60)
On May 1, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0871)
On April 21, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 871 (effective-see bill)
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (11-Y 28-N)
- Senate rejected Gov's recommendation (11-Y 28-N)
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2001 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1745ER)
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- Senate amendment accepted by conference committee
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senators: Trumbo, Hawkins, Lambert
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Delegates: Thomas, Bolvin, Suit
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: INSIST ON AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2001 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 98-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 24, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 013309956-H1
- Motion to refer to committee rejected
- Committee substitute agreed to 013309956-H1
- Read second time
On January 23, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with sub (25-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 013309956-H1
On January 15, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/20/00 013145956
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (13)
April 4, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
April 4, 2001: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (11-Y 28-N)
February 23, 2001: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2001: VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: INSIST ON AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2001: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
February 8, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2001: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2001: Reported from General Laws with sub (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor