+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0231)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 231 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1740ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 095639692-S1 (95-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1740S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 095639692-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 095639692-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1740H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 095615568-H1
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 095615568-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance
On January 7, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 098228692
+ − Votes (10)
February 26, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
February 20, 2009: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2009: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor