+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
On December 22, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101919D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice