+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 3 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB174ER)
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (23-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982915837
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor