+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Finance (15-Y 2-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 8-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 991207316-E
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (30-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Claims with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Claims sub-committee: 1
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Claims
- Presented & ordered printed 991207316
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 17, 1999: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (15-Y 2-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 8-N)
February 5, 1999: Reported from Appropriations with amd. (30-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1999: Reported from Claims with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor