+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 278 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1735ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101766D
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2013: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2013: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor