+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 456 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1734ER)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100594D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 18, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2019: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2019: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2019: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 10, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor