+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0123)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 123 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1732ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 17101683D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1732E
- Amendment by Delegate Yancey agreed to
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101683D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2017: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2017: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor