+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0774)
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (95-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 774 (effective 7/1/23)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1730ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1730ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 23107269D-S2 (97-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rehabilitation and Social Services Committee substitute rejected 23107158D-S1
- Floor substitute printed 23107269D-S2 (Surovell)
- Read third time
- Substitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 23107269D-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1730S2
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 23107158D-S1
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1730H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 23106020D-H1
On February 5, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 23106020D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100223D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
April 12, 2023: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (95-Y 0-N)
April 12, 2023: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2023: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2023: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2023: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2023: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2023: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2023: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2023: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2023: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor