+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2013 in Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N)
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 26-N)
- Read third time and passed House (73-Y 26-N)
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 3-N)
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N)
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 9, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103303D
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2012: Continued to 2013 in Finance (14-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 7-N)
February 3, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 26-N)
January 30, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 3-N)
January 23, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor