+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House (53-Y 46-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 46-N)
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Amendments by Del. Morgan withdrawn
- Passed by temporarily
- Read second time
- Committee amendments rejected
- Substitute by Del's. Rust/Bennett agreed to 012940924-H1
- Floor substitute printed 012940924-H2 ( Bennett and Rust)
- Pending question ordered
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (51-Y 47-N)
- Engrossed by House - floor sub 012940924-H1 (51-Y 47-N)
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT #2 (51-Y 48-N)
- Engrossed by House - floor sub. 012940924-H1 (51-Y 48-N)
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd (12-Y 10-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/20/00 017115208