+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House (53-Y 46-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 46-N)
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Substitute by Del's. Bennett/Rust agreed to 012939924-H1
- Read second time
- Passed by temporarily
- Committee amendments rejected
- Pending question ordered
- Floor substitute printed 012939924-H1 ( Bennett and Rust)
- Amendment by Del. Morgan withdrawn
- Pending question ordered
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (52-Y 46-N)
- Engrossed by House - floor sub. 012939924-H1 (52-Y 46-N)
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds (12-Y 10-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/20/00 017113208
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 46-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (52-Y 46-N)
January 26, 2001: Reported from Finance with amds (12-Y 10-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor