+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Stricken from docket by Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Read second time
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 18, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed LD1742376
+ − Votes (2)
February 2, 1995: Stricken from docket by Rules (10-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1995: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor