+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 17, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211)
On March 14, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 211 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1724ER)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Wills/Trusts/Estates
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD8582152-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Floor amendment agreed to (Clement)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3/4
On January 18, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed LD8582152