+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 815 (effective 7/1/19)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0815)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1722ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106667D-S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1722S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 3-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 19106667D-S1 (72-Y 17-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 17-N 1-A)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19106667D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (72-Y 20-N 2-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 20-N 2-A)
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1722H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105919D-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19105919D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 4-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Referred from Rules by voice vote
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102020D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 17-N 1-A)
February 13, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 3-N)
February 12, 2019: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 20-N 2-A)
January 28, 2019: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor