+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 7, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0774)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 774 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1722ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (90-Y 9-N)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 9-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1722H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107516D-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 20107516D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 2-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed 20105382D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
March 3, 2020: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
February 28, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
February 11, 2020: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 9-N)
February 7, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 2-N)
February 3, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Danica A. Roem
Type:
Primary Sponsor