+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 447 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1720ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Charters
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented and ordered printed 20103594D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2020: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
William C. Wampler III
Type:
Primary Sponsor