+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left in Commerce and Labor
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed bill reprinted 11104774D-EH1
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104774D-H1
- Read second time
- Amendment by Delegate Merricks agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1718EH1
- Printed as engrossed 11100653D-E
On February 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11104774D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Rereferred to Commerce and Labor
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100653D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor