+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0208)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 208 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1717ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Referred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101107D
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2011: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor