+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 22, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0405)
On March 20, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 405 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1713ER)
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws with amds (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2001 in the House:
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-Y)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 018154928-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 018154928-H1
- Read second time
On January 26, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 018154928-H1
On January 24, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from S.T. w/sub (20-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/18/00 018104928
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 21, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2001: Reported from General Laws with amds (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2001: Reported from S.T. w/sub (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor