+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute rejected 073461260-H1
- Read second time
- Substitute by Delegate Callahan agreed to 073492260-H2
- Floor substitute printed 073492260-H2 (Callahan)
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1712H2
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 073461260-H1
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay (Ingram)
On December 15, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 074381129