+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 20105001D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsor
Sally L. Hudson
Type:
Primary Sponsor