+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N)
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
On December 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100952D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
January 25, 2019: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N)
January 21, 2019: Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N)
January 16, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor