+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
- Enacted, Chapter 776 (effective 7/1/11)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1708ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2011 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1708ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11101151D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1708E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: #3 Teachers and Admin. Action
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101151D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 6, 2011: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 6, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2011: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2011: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor