+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0449)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 449 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1707ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11101335D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1707E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101335D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 16, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor