+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 488 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1703ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #2
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101982D
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2013: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor