+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 92 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1697ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health and Human Resources
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101112D
+ − Votes (7)
February 14, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2011: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor