+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chair votes No
- Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N)
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N)
- Read third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N)
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 7-N)
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns
On January 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101077D
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2017: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
February 16, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N)
January 25, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N)
January 20, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 7-N)
January 19, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor