+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0495)
On March 22, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 495 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1696ER)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Amendment No. 1 by Sen. Reynolds rejected (19-Y 21-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendment No. 1 by Sen. Reynolds agreed to (21-Y 19-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1 (21-Y 19-N)
- Amendments Nos. 2 & 3 by Sen. Reynolds agreed to
- Amendment No. 1 by Sen. Reynolds reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1 (19-Y 21-N)
- Amendments Nos. 4 & 5 by Sen. Stolle agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendments (28-Y 9-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (28-Y 9-N)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (85-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read third time
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE(99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 010309684-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/15/00 010309684
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1 (21-Y 19-N)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (28-Y 9-N)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1 (19-Y 21-N)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2001: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2001: Reported from C. J. with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor