+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0323)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 323 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1695ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (22-Y 13-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 4-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 10-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 20105224D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2020: Passed Senate (22-Y 13-N)
February 20, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 4-N)
February 4, 2020: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N)
January 29, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
David L. Bulova
Type:
Primary Sponsor