+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 3-N)
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
On December 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100943D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
January 29, 2019: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N)
January 22, 2019: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 3-N)
January 17, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor