+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (10-Y 4-N)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1692H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104491D-H1
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104491D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101165D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2015: Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (10-Y 4-N)
February 19, 2015: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2015: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
January 27, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor