+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 9, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0842)
On May 5, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 842 (effective 7/1/95)
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 5, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: RECONSIDERATION REJECTED (49-Y 49-N)
- Rec. of Gov's recommendation rejected (49-Y 49-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 48-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (48-Y 48-N)
On March 27, 1995 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1692ER)
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
On January 25, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed LD8721136