+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0074)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 74 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB169ER)
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (71-Y 27-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 27-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (66-Y 27-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 27-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (19-Y 4-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 985952484
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 27-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 27-N)
January 27, 1998: Reported from Finance (19-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor