+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 2, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832)
On April 9, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 832 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB169ER)
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 26, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N)
- Read third time and passed House (86-Y 10-N)
On January 25, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 002456884-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 12, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 002456884
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N)
January 20, 2000: Reported from C. J. with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor